LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB645
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB645
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB645
Compare Versions
SB645 Amended August 17, 2015
SB645 Amended July 7, 2015
SB645 Amended June 2, 2015
SB645 Amended April 6, 2015
SB645 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB645 Amended August 17, 2015
SB645 Amended July 7, 2015
SB645 Amended June 2, 2015
SB645 Amended April 6, 2015
SB645 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare