California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB646 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015