California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2015

Amended

Bill June 25, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015