|
08/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3431.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 953.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 508.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|