California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 19, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015