Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 508.) (April 7). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |