California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB671 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015