LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB675
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB675
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB675
Compare Versions
SB675 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB675 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB675 Amended July 16, 2015
SB675 Amended June 23, 2015
SB675 Amended April 21, 2015
SB675 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB675 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB675 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB675 Amended July 16, 2015
SB675 Amended June 23, 2015
SB675 Amended April 21, 2015
SB675 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare