California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB676 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015