Senate | 05/26/2015 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | April 28 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 796.) | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 726.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |