Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
January 21 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Set for hearing January 12 in T. & H. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2479.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hill. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/23/2015
|
Set for hearing August 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1952.) (July 15). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Set for hearing July 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1158.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
April 21 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|