Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|