|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Vidak. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 952.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 592.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|