California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB695 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015