|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2677.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3030.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 949.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 724.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|