LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB698
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB698
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB698
Action History
Senate
02/01/2016
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
04/16/2015
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
03/27/2015
Set for hearing April 15.
Senate
03/19/2015
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and T. & H.
Senate
03/02/2015
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
Senate
02/27/2015
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.