Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | April 29 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |