|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2379.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2639.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2091.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|