Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 509.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|