|
09/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 2531.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 930.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 729.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
April 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|