|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 805, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2446.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2781.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1159.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|