Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 11. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |