Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29). | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing April 29 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |