California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB75 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 19, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2015

Amended

Bill June 16, 2015
Bill March 24, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015