|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2501.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2855.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1019.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|