LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB759
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB759
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB759
Compare Versions
SB759 Chaptered August 25, 2016
SB759 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB759 Amended August 1, 2016
SB759 Amended June 2, 2015
SB759 Amended May 5, 2015
SB759 Amended April 14, 2015
SB759 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB759 Chaptered August 25, 2016
SB759 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB759 Amended August 1, 2016
SB759 Amended June 2, 2015
SB759 Amended May 5, 2015
SB759 Amended April 14, 2015
SB759 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare