Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2016 | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | June 30 hearing: Held in committee for interim study. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |