07/02/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/02/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/24/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2091.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1027.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 921.) (May 5). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |