Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/13/2016 | January 13 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 2901.) | ||
Senate | 01/05/2016 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/05/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | April 29 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |