California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB798 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015