|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 391, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2425.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2716.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1030.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|