California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB806 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 03/02/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 806AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 2, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Vidak  (   Principal   coauthors:   Senators   Cannella   and Fuller   )   (   Principal   coauthors:   Assembly Members   Bigelow,   Mathis,   and Salas   )   (   Coauthors:   Senators   Anderson,   Glazer,   Moorlach,   and Nguyen   )   (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Brough   and Lackey   )  JANUARY 4, 2016 An act to add Section 1011.5 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans' homes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 806, as amended, Vidak. Dr. Charlie Waters Memorial Veterans' Home. Existing law establishes the Veterans' Home of California, under the administration of the Department of Veterans Affairs, including homes in Yountville and Barstow. Existing law also authorizes the Department of General Services, on behalf of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to acquire, design, equip, construct, and establish additional veterans' homes in other locations, including Fresno. This bill would rename the veterans' home in the County of Fresno as the Dr. Charlie Waters Memorial Veterans' Home and would make specified findings of the Legislature regarding Dr. Waters' life. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) Dr. Charlie Waters served his country as a member of the United States Marine Corps from 1951 to 1958, including 13 months of combat in Korea between 1951 and 1952. (b) Following his combat service, Dr. Waters was assigned to the United States Embassy in Montevideo, Uruguay. (c) Dr. Waters served on many boards, commissions, and foundations, serving veterans and the entire community, including the Fresno Marine Corps League, the Veterans Day Parade Committee, the Fresno Veterans Home Foundation, the American Legion, and Toys for Tots. (d) Dr. Waters played a critical role in the establishment of the Veterans' Home of California, Fresno, often testifying before the Legislature to ensure adequate funding for the facility. Dr. Waters, along with help from Chuck Parnell and George Sinopoli, paved the road towards the ultimate opening of the  Veterans Home Located   veterans' home located  in Fresno. (e) In addition to the contributions of Dr. Waters, Chuck Parnell, and George Sinopoli, a large number of community members and organizations dedicated their time and resources towards making the  Veterans   veterans'  home in Fresno a reality. (f) The Veterans' Home of California, Fresno, opened on October 18, 2013, and includes a bronze bust of Dr. Waters, which was unveiled on September 3, 2014, exactly one year before his death. (g) Dr. Waters died September 3, 2015, after a hard-fought battle with cancer. Yet, even while battling this disease, he continued his fight for housing and services for veterans in the central valley and across the nation. SEC. 2. Section 1011.5 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 1011.5. The veterans' home in the County of Fresno, authorized pursuant to Section 15819.60 of the Government Code, shall be named the Dr. Charlie Waters Memorial Veterans' Home.