|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 834, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6021.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3774.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3335.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|