California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB814 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016