|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5512.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6057.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4034.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3998.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|