|
08/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5718.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3847.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3810.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3610.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3418.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|