Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. | ||
Senate | 01/05/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |