California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016