LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB826
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB826
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB826
Compare Versions
SB826 Chaptered June 27, 2016
SB826 Enrolled June 15, 2016
SB826 Amended June 10, 2016
SB826 Amended May 25, 2016
SB826 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB826 Chaptered June 27, 2016
SB826 Enrolled June 15, 2016
SB826 Amended June 10, 2016
SB826 Amended May 25, 2016
SB826 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare