California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB827 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 15, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 27, 2016

Amended

Bill June 10, 2016
Bill May 25, 2016