LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB828
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB828
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB828
Compare Versions
SB828 Chaptered June 27, 2016
SB828 Enrolled June 16, 2016
SB828 Amended June 12, 2016
SB828 Amended May 25, 2016
SB828 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB828 Chaptered June 27, 2016
SB828 Enrolled June 16, 2016
SB828 Amended June 12, 2016
SB828 Amended May 25, 2016
SB828 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare