Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3537.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |