06/24/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2015. | |||
06/24/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2015 | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1511.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2015 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2052.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 380.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |