Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 31). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 5981.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3537.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |