LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB834
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB834
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB834
Compare Versions
SB834 Amended August 29, 2016
SB834 Amended August 19, 2016
SB834 Amended June 12, 2016
SB834 Amended May 25, 2016
SB834 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB834 Amended August 29, 2016
SB834 Amended August 19, 2016
SB834 Amended June 12, 2016
SB834 Amended May 25, 2016
SB834 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare