LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB835
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB835
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB835
Compare Versions
SB835 Chaptered September 13, 2016
SB835 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB835 Amended August 23, 2016
SB835 Amended August 19, 2016
SB835 Amended June 10, 2016
SB835 Amended May 25, 2016
SB835 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB835 Chaptered September 13, 2016
SB835 Enrolled August 30, 2016
SB835 Amended August 23, 2016
SB835 Amended August 19, 2016
SB835 Amended June 10, 2016
SB835 Amended May 25, 2016
SB835 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare