|
06/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4380.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3539.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|