California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB839 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2016

Amended

Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 25, 2016