Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5509.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5509.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5511.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3541.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |