Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6330.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6372.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5946.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3543.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|